Bharat Bhavan
H O M E

Events
Calendar

Hall Booking

user instructions
Work Update
Photos work '05
Photos 2004
Bookings Archive
Links at end


ICCA home:
www.icca.co.nr
Flag of India

Veggie Lunch*, FREE taster of Vedic Maths
Saturday 18 Aug. 2007, 12 noon to 2p.m (Vedic Maths starts at 1p.m)
Bharat Bhavan (India House), ex-library, nr. Railway Bridge, Mill Road, Cambridge

*Lunch: 3-50 adults, less for children

Book lunch by Fri 17 Aug:

Or ring: 07834-600 450

Vedic Maths breathed life into numbers and the decimal system at its best: the late Jagadguru Swami Sri Bharati Krsna Tirthaji Maharaja's priceless gift to humankind. (Jagadguru is world guru).

Vedic Maths has 16 sutras with some sub-sutras.

  • 88 X 98
  • = 8624

The sutra VERTICALLY AND CROSSWISE can give the answer without using pen and paper.
As the numbers to multiply are both near 100:

  •    88   - 12 (88 is 12 below the base 100, 98 is 02 below 100)

X 98   - 02

The 86 in the answer comes from subtracting crosswise: 88 - 02 = 86
(or 98 - 12 = 86: it is the same-different).
  And the 24 in the answer is just 12 x 02:  multiplying vertically.
  So, 88 x 98 = 8624: Vedic maths is a wonder, unforgettable

    

When the numbers are bigger than the base:

  • 103 x 104 = 10712

        103   + 03
     X 104   + 04

The answer is in two parts: 107 and 12,

107 is just 103 + 04 (or 104 + 03),
and 12 is just 03 x 04.

  • Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342

107 + 06 = 113 and 07 x 06 = 42

 

A quick way to square numbers that end in 5 using the sutra BY ONE MORE THAN THE ONE BEFORE.

  • 752 = 5625


The answer is in two parts: 56 and 25.
The last part is always 25.
The first part is the first number, 7, multiplied by the number "one more", which is 8:
so 7 x 8 = 56

  • Similarly 852 = 7225 because 8 x 9 = 72.

 

Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures are the same and the last figures add up to 10.

  • 32 x 38 = 1216

Both numbers here start with 3 and the last figures (2 and 8) add up to 10.

So we just multiply 3 by 4 (the next number up) to get 12 for the first part of the answer.

And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to get the last part of the answer.

  •  81 x 89 = 7209

We put 09 since we need two figures as in all the other examples where more than one digit numbers are involved.

 

  • 21 x 23 = 483

This is normally called long multiplication but actually the answer can be written straight down using the VERTICALLY AND CROSSWISE sutra.

- - - rainbow line - - -


top of page | Bharat Bhavan HOME | Events calendar | Booking
Work Update | instructions & user details | Photos inside hall | Bookings Archive


This page is www.rainbow-cambridge.org.uk/icca/vedic-maths.htm

R a i n b o w Network Cambridge

View Stats Rainbow Network - - View Stats Bharat Bhavan